GA SR432 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION resolving the issues surrounding human trafficking and transport in and around Metropolitan Atlanta by implementing a recognizable brand bridging awareness with safety and rescue; and for other purposes.
Title
Human Trafficking; transport in and around metro Atlanta; implement recognizable brand; resolve the issues
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56106 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/185388 |