GA SR415 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to prohibit raising the rate of state income taxes currently in effect; to provide for submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Taxes; increase in state income tax rate prohibited -CA
Sponsors
Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Sen. Cecil Staton [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #756 (Y: 42 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #810 (Y: 119 N: 54 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #811 (Y: 55 N: 118 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #493 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #494 (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #497 (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #810 (Y: 119 N: 54 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #811 (Y: 55 N: 118 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #493 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #494 (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #497 (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-22 | Act 592 | |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2014-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |