GA SR371 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION making renewed application to the Congress of the United States to call for a convention for the purpose of proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States; and for other purposes.
Title
U.S. Congress; making renewed application to call for a convention for purpose of proposing an amendment to U.S. Constitution
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] |
Sen. Barry Loudermilk [R] | Sen. Earl Carter [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - House Vote #541 (Y: 108 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #127 (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #127 (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2013-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |