GA SR30 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-01 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-01 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION appointing Matthew Mashburn to the State Election Board; and for other purposes.
Title
State Election Board; Matthew Mashburn; appoint
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - Senate - Adoption: Senate Vote #17 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |