GA SR29 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION applying for a convention of the states under Article V of the United States Constitution; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Article V of the United States Constitution; a convention of the states; apply to Congress for balanced budget amendment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Adoption: Senate Vote #58 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-23HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-02-22SenateSenate Third Read
2021-02-18SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-17SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-01-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-01-27SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback