GA SR267 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION authorizing the granting of nonexclusive easements for the construction, operation, and maintenance of facilities, utilities, roads, and ingress and egress in, on, over, under, upon, across, or through property owned by the State of Georgia in the counties of Baldwin, Barrow, Bartow, Chatham, Clarke, Clayton, Cobb, DeKalb, Floyd, Fulton, Gordon, Houston, Laurens, Liberty, Lowndes, Macon, McIntosh, Meriwether, Newton, Polk, Richmond, Troup, Walton, and Wayne; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Property; granting of nonexclusive easements for the construction, operation, and maintenance of facilities, utilities; 24 counties
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #363 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Vote #301 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #111 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Vote #301 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #111 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-04-30 | Act 38 | |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hopper |