GA SR266 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION authorizing the conveyance of certain state owned real property; authorizing the conveyance of certain state owned real property; authorizing the leasing of certain state owned real properties; authorizing the ground lease of certain state owned real property; authorizing the conveyance of a real property interest in Paulding County; authorizing the leasing of certain state owned real property located in Troup County; authorizing the conveyance of certain state owned real property located in Upson County; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property Conveyance; authorizing 10 counties
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #362 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Vote #300 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #110 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Vote #300 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #110 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 308 | |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hopper |