GA SR229 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Act 72
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Act 72
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION authorizing the granting of non-exclusive easements for the construction, operation, and maintenance of facilities, utilities, roads, and ingress and egress in, on, over, under, upon, across, or through property owned by the State of Georgia in Bleckley, Cherokee, Douglas, Evans, Glynn, Hall, Laurens, Rockdale, Upson, and Walton Counties; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes
Title
Public Property; granting of non-exclusive easements for the construction, operation, and maintenance of facilities, utilities, roads; authorize 10 counties
Sponsors
Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #315 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #305 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #140 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #305 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #140 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Act 72 | |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |