GA SR214 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee on Local Option Sales Tax and Service Delivery Strategy; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Study Committee on Local Option Sales Tax and Service Delivery Strategy; create
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Shawn Still [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #280 (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Adopt: House Vote #283 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Adoption: Senate Vote #174 (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Adopt: House Vote #283 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Adoption: Senate Vote #174 (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2023-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-20 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-03-20 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |