GA SR159 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Study Committee on the Parenting Time Deviation in Georgia's Child Support Guidelines Statute, O.C.G.A. Code Section 19-6-15; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate Study Committee on the Parenting Time Deviation in Georgia's Child Support Guidelines Statute, O.C.G.A. Code Section 19-6-15; create
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] |
Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/64470 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/214842 |