GA SR154 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-15)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee for Strengthening Georgia's Future Workforce; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Study Committee for Strengthening Georgia's Future Workforce; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Adoption By Substitute: Senate Vote #180 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-11 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |