GA SR143 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION appointing the honorary position of General Assembly chaplain; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Assembly Chaplain; honorary position; appoint

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-05 - Senate - Adoption: Senate Vote #144 (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-03-08HouseHouse First Readers
2021-03-05SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-03-05SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-05SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-05SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-03SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-01SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-24SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-23SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback