GA SR135 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize the General Assembly to provide by law for pari-mutuel wagering on horse racing; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
General Assembly; authorize to provide by law for pari-mutuel wagering on horse racing -CA
Sponsors
Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] |
Sen. Ronald Ramsey [D] | Sen. Donzella James [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hopper |