GA SR1035 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the President to pardon the three Navy SEALs facing court martial proceedings in the capture of terrorist Ahmed Hashim Abed; and for other purposes.
Title
U.S. President; urged to pardon three Navy SEALs facing court martial proceedings
Sponsors
Sen. Don Balfour [R] | Sen. John Douglas [R] | Sen. Dan Moody [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] |
Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. John Wiles [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #809 - Consent Calendar Expressing The Will Of The Senate (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Read and Referred |