GA SR1031 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to declare English as the official language of the State of Georgia; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
State of Georgia; English as official language -CA
Sponsors
Sen. Don Balfour [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/41779 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20132014/141072 |