GA SB99 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-11 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-11 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the county special purpose local option sales tax, so as to allow such taxes to be imposed at a rate of less than 1 percent; to provide for the simultaneous levy of more than one tax under such part if the combined rate of such taxes does not exceed 1 percent; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Taxation/Revenue; allow such taxes to be imposed at a rate of less than 1 percent
Sponsors
Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Cecil Staton [R] | Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] |
Sen. Barry Loudermilk [R] | Sen. Bill Heath [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #109 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |