GA SB98 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a short title; to amend Article 1 of Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance generally, so as to provide a definition; to opt out of funding certain abortions through certain qualified health plans; to provide for certain exceptions; to provide for a right of intervention in certain lawsuits; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Federal Abortion Mandate Opt-out Act"
Sponsors
Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Bill Heath [R] |
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Barry Loudermilk [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #794 (Y: 98 N: 67 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #795 (Y: 105 N: 64 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #676 (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #677 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #530 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #545 (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #795 (Y: 105 N: 64 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #676 (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #677 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #530 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #545 (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-21 | Act 547 | |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2014-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |