GA SB97 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue and taxation, so as to modify certain provisions relating to tax executions; to require due diligence in notifying taxpayers that taxes have not been paid and that an execution shall be issued; to provide a definition; to change the timing of the sale of tax executions; to repeal the fee collected for issuing tax executions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and Taxation; modify certain provisions relating to tax executions
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Sen. Bill Heath [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43527 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/147362 |