GA SB96 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-984 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Professional Standards Commission's authority to create and implement standards and procedures for certifying educational personnel, recommending standards and procedures for certification, continuation of teaching certificates, and restrictions, so as to provide that the commission's standards and procedures for certification programs shall be neutral with respect to whether such programs are provided by for profit or not for profit entities and shall consider teacher programs outside of this state which meet certain requirements of the commission; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professional Standards Commission; the commission's standards and procedures for certification programs shall be neutral; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hopper |