GA SB95 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Resolution By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Resolution By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state government, so as to provide conditions for meetings and public hearings to be held by teleconference in emergency conditions; to provide conditions for certain agency members to participate in nonemergency meetings by teleconference; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Government; conditions for meetings and public hearings to be held by teleconference in emergency conditions; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #344 (Y: 100 N: 67 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #335 (Y: 100 N: 62 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #334 (Y: 76 N: 89 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #121 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #106 (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #335 (Y: 100 N: 62 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #334 (Y: 76 N: 89 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #121 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #106 (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Resolution By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | House | House Reconsidered |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-25 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Hopper |