GA SB89 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Decatur, approved April 13, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, p. 4351), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 11, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 4836), so as to change the corporate limits of the city; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Decatur; corporate limits; change
Sponsors
Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Gail Davenport [D] |
Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #329 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #54 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #54 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 237 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |