GA SB86 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 5 of Title 16 and Title 17 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to stalking and criminal procedure, respectively, so as to provide greater protection to victims of family violence; to define "family violence order"; to change provisions relating to arrests with and without warrants involving family violence orders; to change provisions relating to bail for persons charged with violating family violence orders; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Family Violence Order; provide greater protection of victims of family violence
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Rep. Alex Atwood [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #391 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Vote #351 (Y: 152 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #45 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Vote #351 (Y: 152 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #45 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 207 | |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2013-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-20 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2013-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hopper |