GA SB70 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to campaign finance regulation and disclosure, so as to require special expedited reporting of certain campaign contributions; to provide that the contributions subject to such reporting shall be those where there exists a contractual, grant, or regulatory relationship between the contributor and the office of the public officer or candidate for public office; to define terms; to provide for the manner and contents of reports; to provide for civil enforcement; to provide for other related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Election; reporting of certain campaign contributions; require special expedited reporting
Sponsors
Sen. David Adelman [D] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. George Hooks [D] | Sen. Lester Jackson [D] |
Sen. Ronald Ramsey [D] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #91 - Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-04-01 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-04 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-03 | House First Readers | |
2009-02-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-02-10 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-02-06 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-30 | Senate Read and Referred |