GA SB579 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Cordele, approved July 29, 2020 (Ga. L. 2020, p. 4122), so as to transition the office of chairperson to at large commission member; to provide for a mayor to be selected by and among the commission members; to redesignate the office of vice chairperson to mayor pro tempore; to revise voting and quorum provisions related to the commission; to make conforming changes; to provide that the city manager shall recommend the annual budget to the commission in place of the chairperson; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Cordele; transition the office of chairperson to at large commission member; mayor to be selected by and among the commission members; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #712 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-21 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |