GA SB530 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Mansfield; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, and powers of the city; to provide for a governing authority of such city and the powers, duties, authority, election, terms, method of filling vacancies, compensation, qualifications, prohibitions, and removal from office relative to members of such governing authority; to provide for definitions and construction; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide for an effective date; to repeal a specific Act; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Mansfield, City of; provide a new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #806 - Local Calendar (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #669 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #669 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-12 | Act 564 | |
2012-04-12 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-04 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-29 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-27 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-26 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Read and Referred |