GA SB505 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Act 427
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Act 427
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation of hospitals and related institutions, so as to revise provisions relating to required publication by hospital of certain financial documents on its website; to provide for uniform reporting requirements; to require hospitals to annually provide the Uniform Resource Locator for the webpage containing the financial documents; to provide for increased penalties for noncompliance; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Hospitals and Related Institutions; required publication by hospital of certain financial documents on its website; provisions; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #885 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #757 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #586 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #757 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #586 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Act 427 | |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2024-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-13 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2024-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |