GA SB504 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Veto V4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a nonbinding advisory referendum for the purpose of ascertaining whether the electors of Glynn County desire the Glynn County Board of Commissioners to abolish the Glynn County Police Department; to provide for legislative purposes and findings; to provide for procedures and requirements relating thereto; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electors of Glynn County; nonbinding advisory referendum; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-22 - House - House Vote #686 (Y: 159 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #638 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-05 Veto V4
2020-08-05SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-25SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2020-06-22HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-06-22HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-19HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-06-17HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-06-16HouseHouse First Readers
2020-06-15SenateSenate Transmitted House
2020-06-15SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-03-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-03-12SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-11SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback