GA SB501 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-31 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-31 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 32 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions for the Department of Transportation, so as to modify provisions relating to the State Transportation Board; to provide for the appointment of a treasurer of transportation; to require the treasurer and assistant treasurer to maintain certain certifications; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Transportation, Department of; modify provisions for the State Transportation Board; provide for the appointment of a treasurer
Sponsors
Sen. John Douglas [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Sen. Mitch Seabaugh [R] | Sen. Preston Smith [R] |
Sen. Cecil Staton [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #642 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-30 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-22 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Read and Referred |