GA SB5 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 50-27-13 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to disposition of lottery proceeds, budget report by Governor, appropriations by General Assembly, and shortfall reserve subaccount, so as to establish the percentage of the lottery proceeds for each fiscal year which must equal the net proceeds to be transferred to the state treasury for credit to the Lottery for Education Account; to provide for exceptions; to provide for verification of certain information by the Department of Audits and Accounts; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lottery for Education; net proceeds transferred to the state treasury for credit to the Lottery for Education Account; establish the percentage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #102 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-24SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-24SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-23SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback