GA SB489 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to emergency medical services, so as to require the Georgia Trauma Care Network Commission to report annually to the House and Senate Committees on Health and Human Services documenting certain outcomes and verifying certain expenditures of funds; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Trauma Care Network Commission; report annually; House/Senate Committees on Health and Human Services; outcomes
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] |
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote #736 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #592 - Passage As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #593 - Passage As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #592 - Passage As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #593 - Passage As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-02 | Act 757 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-19 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-13 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-12 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Read and Referred |