GA SB475 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Grayson, approved April 20, 2011 (Ga. L. 2011, p. 3567), so as to revise the terms of the mayor and city council; to provide for elections by a plurality of votes; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Grayson; terms of the mayor and city council; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #792 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #759 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #548 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #759 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #548 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 395 | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2020-06-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-10 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Hopper |