GA SB474 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding the Department of Economic Development, so as to provide for the Department of Natural Resources to construct, operate, maintain, and supply informational materials at welcome centers assigned to it by the Governor; to provide for the installation and operation of automated teller machines and cash-dispensing machines at welcome centers; to provide for the installation, operation, and setting of product prices for vending machines; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Department of Natural Resources; construct, operate, maintain, and supply informational materials at welcome centers assigned to it by the Governor; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - House - House Vote #700 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #570 (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #570 (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 382 | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Hopper |