GA SB472 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Effective Date 2022-03-04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Effective Date 2022-03-04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to organization and members of the Public Service Commission, so as to change the description of the election districts for members of the Public Service Commission; to provide for manner of election and terms of office; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Service Commission; description of the election districts for members; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - Immediately Transmit: House Vote #613 (Y: 96 N: 68 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Passage: House Vote #612 (Y: 97 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 6th: Senate Vote #543 (Y: 22 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #544 (Y: 33 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Motion To Table: Senate Vote #542 (Y: 21 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-04 - House - Passage: House Vote #612 (Y: 97 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 6th: Senate Vote #543 (Y: 22 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #544 (Y: 33 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Motion To Table: Senate Vote #542 (Y: 21 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Effective Date 2022-03-04 | |
2022-03-04 | Act 565 | |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-03-04 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Notice to Reconsider |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |