GA SB470 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 9 of Chapter 9 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to computer security, so as to provide a definition; to provide that it shall be illegal to prevent reasonable efforts to block the installation, execution, or disabling of a covered file-sharing program on computers; to provide that it shall be illegal to install, offer to install, or make available for installation, reinstallation, or update a covered file-sharing program on a computer without first providing clear and conspicuous notice to the authorized user of the computer that the files on that computer will be made available to the public, obtaining consent of the authorized user to install the program, and requiring affirmative steps by the authorized user to activate any feature on the program that will make files on that computer available to the public; and for other purposes.
Title
Computer Security; illegal to prevent reasonable efforts to block installation or execution of a covered file-sharing program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #622 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 422 | |
2010-05-20 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-13 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-30 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-26 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-22 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Read and Referred |