GA SB47 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 10 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to magistrate courts, so as to change provisions relating to training for magistrates and senior magistrates; to change provisions relating to the composition and responsibilities of the Georgia Magistrate Courts Training Council; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Magistrate Courts Training Council; training for magistrates/senior magistrates; composition/responsibilities; provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. John Crosby [R] | Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] |
Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] | Sen. Freddie Sims [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - House Vote #311 - Passage (Y: 155 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Vote #310 - Bearden Am 28 1115 (Y: 73 N: 92 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #33 - Passage As Amended (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Vote #310 - Bearden Am 28 1115 (Y: 73 N: 92 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #33 - Passage As Amended (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-12 | Act 172 | |
2011-05-12 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-18 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-30 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-24 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-23 | House First Readers | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Read and Referred |