GA SB464 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to civil practice, so as to provide for uniform laws governing mediation and participants in mediation; to provide for definitions; to provide for privileges against disclosure, admissibility, and discovery; to provide for waiver and preclusion of privilege; to provide for exceptions to privilege; to provide for confidentiality and mediator disclosure of conflicts; to provide for international commercial mediation and electronic signatures; to provide for uniformity of construction and severability; to provide for applicability; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Georgia Uniform Mediation Act"; uniform laws governing mediation and participants in mediation; provide; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #620 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-25HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2020-06-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-13HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-12SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-03-12SenateSenate Third Read
2020-03-12SenateSenate Taken from Table
2020-03-12SenateSenate Tabled
2020-03-10SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-03-02SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-28SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback