GA SB464 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 4 of Chapter 4 of Title 27 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to crabs, so as to limit the number of commercial crabbing licenses issued; to provide for the requirement of a court document when transferring a commercial crabbing licenses upon a death; to provide for the sale of commercial crabbing licenses in certain instances; to provide for specific penalties for the unlawful taking of crabs from the traps of another; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fish and Fishing; limit the number of commercial crabbing licenses issued
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #877 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #760 - Passage (Y: 159 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #569 - Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #760 - Passage (Y: 159 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #569 - Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-02 | Act 712 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-12 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-07 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Read and Referred |