GA SB463 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to remove provisions and references regarding direct recording electronic voting machines; to revise certain duties of the State Election Board; to provide for the deadline for registering to vote in certain runoffs; to provide for the number of voting booths or enclosures; to provide for the division of certain precincts under certain circumstances; to provide for certain reports on time required to vote; to provide for the acceptance of absentee ballots when certain identification is provided; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Primaries and Elections; provisions and references regarding direct recording electronic voting machines; remove

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #594 (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #596 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2020-06-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-13HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-12SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-12SenateSenate Third Read
2020-03-12SenateSenate Engrossed
2020-03-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-03-04SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-03-02SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-28SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback