GA SB46 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 17 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to control of sexually transmitted disease, so as to require physicians and healthcare providers to test all pregnant women for HIV and syphilis at the first prenatal visit, at 28–32 weeks' gestation, and at delivery; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Control of Sexually Transmitted Disease; physicians and healthcare providers to test all pregnant women for HIV and syphilis at the first prenatal visit, at 28–32 weeks' gestation, and at delivery; require
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #236 (Y: 169 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #110 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #110 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-05-02 | Act 230 | |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hopper |