GA SB459 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 3 of Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the generation and distribution of electricity generally, so as to provide that consumers may elect not to use smart meters; to provide that the Public Service Commission may create and regulate a surcharge for consumers who elect not to use smart meters; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Electric Utilities; consumers may elect not to use smart meters; Public Service Commission may create/regulate a surcharge for consumers who elect not to use smart meters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #612 - Passage As Amended (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-12 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-17 | Senate Read and Referred |