GA SB447 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a Board of Commissioners of Glascock County, approved February 8, 1945 (Ga. L. 1945, p. 569), as amended, so as to add two members to the board; to provide for the districts for the election of members of the board; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for the method of election and continuation in office; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Commissioners of Glascock County; add two members to the board
Sponsors
Sen. Max Burns [R] | Rep. Mack Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #510 (Y: 153 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #480 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #480 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Effective Date 2022-02-17 | |
2022-02-17 | Act 440 | |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hopper |