GA SB447 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-161.2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to work based learning programs, legislative intent, participation, standards, coordination, and funding, so as to provide for definitions regarding work based learning and related positions and programs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Work Based Learning Programs; definitions regarding work based learning and related positions and programs; provide
Sponsors
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #581 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |