GA SB443 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 18 of the O.C.G.A., relating to garnishment proceedings, so as to revise procedures for garnishment proceedings; to provide for uniform procedures for garnishment actions; to provide definitions; to limit the maximum part of disposable earnings subject to garnishment in relation to certain educational or student loans; to provide a fixed time for continuous garnishments; to amend Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to scholarships, loans, and grants, so as to provide for cross-references; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Garnishment Proceedings; revise; uniform procedures for garnishment actions; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #580 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-12HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-10SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-10SenateSenate Third Read
2020-03-04SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-03-03SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-26SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-25SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback