GA SB440 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 406
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 406
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Soperton, approved March 14, 1984 (Ga. L. 1984, p. 4212), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 29, 2007 (Ga. L. 2007, p. 4206), so as to annex certain tracts or parcels of land into the City of Soperton and to change the description of the council districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Soperton; certain tracts or parcels of land; annex; description of the council districts; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House Vote #694 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #480 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #480 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Act 406 | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |