GA SB437 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 14 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to corporations, partnerships, and associations, so as to provide for the formation of general cooperative associations under the laws of this state; to provide for duties of the Secretary of State; to provide for procedures and requirements for membership in and the formation, governance, management, meetings, voting, and dissolution of general cooperative associations; to provide for exceptions for applicability; to provide for definitions; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
'Georgia Cooperative Associations Code'; formation of general cooperative associations under the laws of this state; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |