GA SB431 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for the election of a chairperson and four members of the Worth County Board of Education, approved March 12, 1986 (Ga. L. 1986, p. 3716), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 5, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 4074), so as to change the description of the education districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Worth County Board of Education; description of the education districts; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #506 (Y: 144 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #473 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #473 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Effective Date 2022-02-17 | |
2022-02-17 | Act 394 | |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-02-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |