GA SB428 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 15 of Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the "Fair Business Practices Act of 1975," so as to prohibit the deceptive practice of musical performance groups advertising and appearing as the recording group without the recording group's permission or denoting that it is a salute or tribute performance; to provide for definitions; to specify violations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Fair Business Practices Act of 1975"; deceptive practice of musical performance; without recording group's permission; prohibit
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #608 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #608 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |