GA SB427 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 475
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 19-6-15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to child support in final verdict or decree, guidelines for determining amount of award, continuation of duty to provide support, and duration of support, so as to change provisions relating to the court's discretion in making a final determination of support; to change provisions relating to reliable evidence of income, voluntary unemployment, and involuntary loss of income to account for a parent's incarceration; to change provisions relating to health insurance; to change provisions relating to specific and nonspecific deviations; to change provisions relating to work related child care costs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Support in Final Verdict or Decree; court's discretion in making a final determination of support; provisions; change

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #802 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #772 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #490 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Act 475
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-23SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-13SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback