GA SB420 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 32-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Act 496
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 32-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Act 496
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to agriculture, so as to prohibit the acquisition of possessory interest in certain land by certain foreign persons and entities; to provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions; to provide for civil actions; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for disclosures; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Agriculture; acquisition of possessory interest in certain land by certain foreign persons and entities; prohibit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #790 (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #735 (Y: 97 N: 67 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #604 (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #735 (Y: 97 N: 67 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #604 (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Act 496 | |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2024-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Hopper |