GA SB415 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Veto V19
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Veto V19
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public utilities and public transportation, so as to provide for the regulation of private emergency warning point to multipoint systems by the Public Service Commission; to define certain terms; to provide for audits; to provide for immunity from liability for failure to deliver information over an emergency warning point to multipoint system; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Utilities; provide regulation of private emergency warning point to multipoint systems by Public Service Commission
Sponsors
Sen. John Douglas [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Rep. Doug Stoner [D] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #934 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #606 - Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #606 - Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Veto V19 | |
2010-06-08 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-29 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-29 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-27 | House Postponed | |
2010-04-20 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-30 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-26 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-22 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Read and Referred |